Global Patent Index - EP 1038981 A1

EP 1038981 A1 2000-09-27 - FREE-CUTTING COPPER ALLOY

Title (en)

FREE-CUTTING COPPER ALLOY

Title (de)

AUTOMATENLEGIERUNG AUF KUPFERBASIS

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE DE DECOLLETAGE A BASE DE CUIVRE

Publication

EP 1038981 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953070 A

Priority

  • JP 9805156 W
  • JP 28792198 A

Abstract (en)

Free-cutting alloys with industrially satisfactory machinability comprising 69 to 79 percent, by weight, of copper, 2.0 to 4.0 percent, by weight, of silicon; 0.02 to 0.4, by weight, of lead and the remaining percent, by weight, of zinc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 9/04; C22F 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22C 9/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/08 (2013.01); C22C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1038981 A1 20000927; EP 1038981 A4 20030219; EP 1038981 B1 20050126; AU 1054099 A 20000501; AU 738301 B2 20010913; CA 2303512 A1 20000420; CA 2303512 C 20060711; DE 69828818 D1 20050303; DE 69828818 T2 20060105; DE 69833582 D1 20060427; DE 69833582 T2 20070118; DE 69835912 D1 20061026; DE 69835912 T2 20070308; EP 1502964 A1 20050202; EP 1502964 B1 20060301; EP 1508626 A1 20050223; EP 1508626 B1 20060913; JP 2000119774 A 20000425; JP 3917304 B2 20070523; KR 100375426 B1 20030310; TW 577931 B 20040301; WO 0022181 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69828818

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69828818

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69828818

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2008-12-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828818 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-02-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030108

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT SE