Global patent index - EP 1039000 A2

EP 1039000 A2 2000-09-27 - Method for determining startup time of weft insertion when changing the speed of the main drive in an air jet loom

Title (en)

Method for determining startup time of weft insertion when changing the speed of the main drive in an air jet loom

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Startzeit des Schusseintrags bei Drehzahlwechsel des Hauptantriebes einer Luftdüsenwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer le temps de démarrage de l'insertion de trame en cas d'un changement de vitesse de l'entraînement principal dans un métier à jet d'air

Publication

EP 1039000 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102515 A

Priority

DE 19913398 A

Abstract (en)

To determine the start time for the weft insertion at a jet loom, on a change of the loom main drive shaft speed, the measured rotary angle ( alpha ) at each time unit for the loom main shaft is taken before and after a speed change as a starting correction for the weft insertion start time (t1,t3,t5). The time of weft arrival (t2,t4,t6) at a monitor, with a constant weft flight time ( DELTA tF) for all speeds, is generally at the same rotary angle ( alpha ) of the loom main shaft as the rotary angle on the weft arrival before the speed change. The time duration ( DELTA tS) between the arrival at the monitor and the closure of the shed is held as a constant value for a constant weft flight time ( DELTA tF) for all speeds. On a change of speed, the start correction for the subsequent weft insertion is through a shift of the start time point (t1,t3,t5), in the direction of a time advance or retard. The retarded start time point (t1,t3,t5) is brought back to a max. reverse to the time point t0 for the max. opening of the loom shed. The start time point (t1,t3,t5) shift for the weft insertion is on the supposition that the time DELTA tF (+) DELTA tS is constant between the weft insertion and the shed closing. After starting the loom, the weft insertion start points (t1,t3,t5) are matched successively to the nominal rotary speeds of the loom drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Startzeitpunktes eines Schussfadeneintrags bei Drehzahlwechsel der Hauptantriebswelle insbesondere einer Luftdüsenwebmaschine, welches eine automatische Angleichung des Startzeitpunktes für den Schusseintrag an die jeweilige Drehzahl der Hauptantriebswelle vornimmt. Erreicht wird dies dadurch, dass anhand einer Abweichung zwischen den gemessenen Drehwinkeln der Hauptantriebswelle vor und nach einem Drehzahlwechsel bei erneutem Drehzahlwechsel automatisch eine Startkorrektur des Schusseintragbeginns im Sinne einer zeitlichen Verlagerung des Startzeitpunktes für den Schusseintrag derart erfolgt, dass die Schussfadenankunft an dem maßgebenden Schussfadenwächter ,bei einer für alle Drehzahlen konstanten Fadenflugzeit, im wesentlichen bei dem gleichen Drehwinkel der Webmaschinenhauptwelle liegt, wie der Drehwinkel bei Schussfadenankunft vor dem Drehzahlwechsel der Webmaschinenhauptwelle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/007 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039000 A2 20000927; EP 1039000 A3 20010822; DE 19913398 A1 20000928; DE 19913398 C2 20010308; JP 2000282349 A 20001010; US 6148872 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050223

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041012

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI