Global patent index - EP 1039003 A1

EP 1039003 A1 2000-09-27 - Sliding tongue needle with split tongue

Title (en)

Sliding tongue needle with split tongue

Title (de)

Schiebernadel mit geteiltem Schieber

Title (fr)

Aiguille à coulisse double

Publication

EP 1039003 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105151 A

Priority

DE 19913822 A

Abstract (en)

The compound needle (1), for a knitting machine, has a sliding section (35,15) with the free legs bent apart towards the hook (4) to form an open funnel shape towards the hook (4). The slide sections (35,15) are bent apart at the junction with the funnel shape to give a sprung lie against zones of the flanks of the slide slit (6). The bends are structured so that the laying points are near the start (11) of the slide slit (6) when the slide (12) is moved into the closed position. The slide sections (35,15) are symmetric to each other, to lie against each other at the end of the funnel shape. Each slide section (35,15) has at least one bending point or only one or only two, where the neighboring part of the slide section (35,15) forms an obtuse angle. The slide (12) can be moved into a knocking-over setting where the legs forming the funnel shape are pushed over the point (5) of the hook (4), and the slide (12) lies at the start (11) of the slide slit (6). The hook point (5) is slightly rounded, and the funnel shape formed by the slide (12) has an opening width which is sufficiently large to match the rounding dia. of the hook point (5). The slide (12) can be moved into a stitch transfer setting where the slide section (35,15) legs move past the sides of the hook (4) to project beyond it. The bent legs are set so that they are parallel to each other beyond the hook (4). The slide section (35,15) zones forming the laying points in the closed setting are outside the slide slit (6) when in the stitch transfer setting.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schiebernadel (1) weist einen aus zwei federnden Schieberteilen (35, 15) gebildeten geteilten Schieber (12) auf, der in einem Schieberschlitz (6) der Schiebernadel (1) verschiebbar gelagert ist. Die Schieberteile (35, 15) sind voneinander weg gewölbt oder gebogen, wobei die Wölbung nahe an dem freien Ende des Schiebers angeordnet ist. Der Abstand zwischen einem Ende des Schieberteils (35 oder 15) bis zu einer ersten Biegestelle (22) stimmt dabei etwa mit dem Abstand zwischen der Spitze (5) des Hakens (4) und dem Anfang (11) des Schieberschlitzes (6) überein. Dadurch wird es möglich, den Abstand zwischen voneinander weg gebogenen Schenkeln (19, 20) der Schieberteile (35, 15), die einen Trichter (17) zur Aufnahme der Spitze (5) des Hakens (4) bilden sollen, sehr gering zu halten. Sowohl die durch die spezielle Biegung verbesserte Führung des Schiebers (12) als auch die lediglich geringere Aufweitung des Trichters (17) erhöhen die Funktionssicherheit und Lebensdauer der Schiebernadel (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039003 A1 20000927; EP 1039003 B1 20030507; DE 19913822 A1 20000928; DE 19913822 C2 20010222; ES 2198241 T3 20040201; JP 2000282353 A 20001010; JP 3232075 B2 20011126; US 6233977 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198241

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50002038

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROZ-BECKERT KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHIMA SEIKI MFG., LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001014

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI