Global patent index - EP 1039008 A2

EP 1039008 A2 2000-09-27 - Method to cover a chair and seats obtained by such a method

Title (en)

Method to cover a chair and seats obtained by such a method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beziehen der Oberfläche eines Sitzmöbels sowie dadurch hergestellte Sitzfläche oder Lehnenfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé pour recouvrir un siège, ainsi que l'assise ou le dossier ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 1039008 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105800 A

Priority

DE 19912398 A

Abstract (en)

To cover the surfaces of seats and/or backrests of furniture, and especially a revolving office chair, the flexible covering material is cut to shape with an additional edging around it. Auxiliary threads are stitched into the edging, to form a holding channel along it. A tensioning cord is fed into the holding channel, to move along it, with additional cord sections at the ends of the cord. The chair surface is covered with the material, so that its edges project round the sides of the chair surface. The edges of the covering material are pulled down and under the chair surface, while the cord is tightened by pulling its ends to reduce its length within the channel and stretch the cover. The auxiliary threads are stitched into the chair covering material, and an auxiliary ribbon (19) is sewn on both sides on to the material, so that the cord channel is between the ribbon (19) and the chair covering material. The auxiliary threads are part of a common seam (20), where they are locked together on the opposite side of the covering material to the ribbon (19). The seam (20) is a double chainstitch, to secure the ribbon (19) to the covering material of fabric or leather. The cord and the ribbon (19) are applied simultaneously to one side of the covering material, while the simultaneous stitching the ribbon is on the other side of the material.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Beziehen der Oberfläche eines Sitzmöbels werden an die Umrandung des Bezugsmaterials Hilfsfäden (15,16) gesteppt, um einen Aufnahmekanal (17) für eine Spannschnur (18) zu bilden. Die Spannschnur kann sich in diesem Aufnahmekanal (17) bewegen, so daß beim Beziehen der Oberfläche durch Spannen der Enden der Spannschnur (18) und Festlegen der Enden möglich ist. Die Hilfsfäden (15,16) werden in das Bezugsmaterial (14) gesteppt und ein Hilfsband (19) wird an seinen beiden Seiten auf das Bezugsmaterial genäht. Dabei bildet sich der Aufnahmekanal (17) zwischen dem Hilfsband (19) und dem Bezugsmaterial (14). Dadurch kann einfach und zuverlässig eine Alternative zur Befestigung von Bezugsmaterialien geschaffen werden, die mit vertretbarem maschinellen Einsatz auch in der Serienproduktion eingesetzt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 1/20 (2013.01); D05D 2303/02 (2013.01); D05D 2303/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039008 A2 20000927; EP 1039008 A3 20010103; DE 19912398 A1 20000928; FR 2791052 A1 20000922; FR 2791052 B3 20010525

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI