Global patent index - EP 1039010 A3

EP 1039010 A3 2000-12-27 - Process and sewing unit for incorporating extra width

Title (en)

Process and sewing unit for incorporating extra width

Title (de)

Verfahren und Näheinheit zum Einarbeiten von Merhweite

Title (fr)

Procédé et unité de couture pour l'incorporation d'épaisseur supplémentaire

Publication

EP 1039010 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105835 A

Priority

DE 19913000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039010A2] To operate a sewing machine for pre-crepe sewing, the initial length and the nominal length of the fabric workpiece are established. The two length values are taken together with the max. gathering value of the differential fabric advance mechanism, for an actual gathering value to be computed to set the differential stitch adjustment unit (3). Using the actual gathering value, a stitch length value is retrieved from a data store (13), taking into account the slippage of the fabric advance system. The actual number of stitches is computed from the nominal length and the actual stitch length value, which determines the end point of the pre-crepe section. The computed gathering value can be provisional to be used with a correction from the data store, taking into account the slippage at the fabric advance mechanism during gathering. The corrected value is used at the differential stitch adjustment unit (3) against the provisional gathering value to give an increased and corrected gathering value for setting. A programmable gathering value setting profile, which can be stored in memory, is in a number of suitable steps towards a weaker or stronger gathering intensity. An Independent claim is included for a sewing machine (1) with a main and differential fabric advance mechanism, a main and differential stitch adjustment unit (2,3), and a setting unit (6) to adjust the differential stitch setter (3). The sewing machine (1) is controlled by a computer (10) with a keyboard (15) and/or interface (12) for the data input. A memory (13) stores the stitch length values according to the slippage of the fabric advance mechanism during gathering. Preferred Features: The setting unit (6) gives equidistant gathering steps matched to the setting characteristic of the differential stitch setting unit (3). The computer is linked to the motor control (8) through a bus (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 19/16 (2006.01); D05B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039010 A2 20000927; EP 1039010 A3 20001227; EP 1039010 B1 20030305; DE 19913000 C1 20001026; JP 2000271362 A 20001003; US 6178904 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2004-01-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50001351

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-03-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFAFF INDUSTRIE MASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI