Global patent index - EP 1039011 A3

EP 1039011 A3 2001-04-11 - Device and method for applying a treating liquid to a running yarn

Title (en)

Device and method for applying a treating liquid to a running yarn

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Auftragen eines Präparationsmittels auf einen laufenden Faden

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour l'apport d'un liquide de traitement sur un fil textile en défilement

Publication

EP 1039011 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105975 A

Priority

  • DE 19913439 A
  • DE 19927366 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039011A2] The appts. to apply a lubricant to a running yarn has a supply container (1) for the preparation divided into compartments (2.1,2.2) for the components (3.1,3.2) of the lubricant. The feed system (5) has a number of inlet channels (9.1,9.2) at the entry side, with separate links to the container compartments (2.1,2.2), for their part-flows to be combined at the outlet side of the feed system (5). At least one dosing unit is in front of the feed system (5), to give a dosed vol. of at least one part-flow. A separate dosing unit (7.1,7.2) is pref. at each flow link (8.1,8.2) between the supply container (1) and the feed system (5), controlled independently of each other. The dosing units can be pumps. The feed system (5) has a mixing chamber (10), where the part-flows are combined. The mixing chamber (10) has one or more mixers (11) to blend the components (3.1,3.2) of the yarn lubricant together. The mixer can be a dynamic mixer. The applicator (14) has a yarn guide (15) with a track (16) forming the yarn channel (16) where a drilling (17) through the guide carries the main lubricant flow to the yarn (18). The applicator (14) can also have a jet to spray the lubricant at the yarn (18). The applicator (14) can also have a rotating roller partially immersed in a container filled with the main lubricant flow, to transfer it to the running yarn (18). An Independent claim is included for the treatment of a running yarn with a lubricant where the lubricant components are held separately in the supply container, to be fed as separate part-flows to be combined into a main application flow. Preferred Features: The part-flows are brought into the main flow by independently dosed vols., where at least one dosed part-flow can be set to give the proportions for the component parts of the main mixed flow. The main flow is composed of the sum of the separate part-flows, to be delivered to the applicator. The components of the yarn lubricant are blended together in the mixing chamber. A further Independent claim is included for a dosing pump with its inlet connected to the mixing chamber, where the part-flows are combined. Preferred Features: The mixers in the mixing chamber are at least partially mounted to a rotating shaft which has a common drive with the impeller which forms the mixing shaft where it enters into the chamber, and is fitted with a motor at the other end. The impeller and the mixing shaft can be separate, interconnected by a reduction gearing. The impeller is composed of one or more pairs of cogwheels, with one or more pump outlets for each pair. The paired cogwheels are driven by a common drive shaft, and the dosed vol. flows are equal for each pair of cogwheels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/30 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01); B01F 5/14 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01); D06B 23/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/205 (2013.01); B01F 5/0618 (2013.01); B01F 5/14 (2013.01); B01F 7/00908 (2013.01); B01F 13/1033 (2013.01); B01F 15/0243 (2013.01); B01F 15/0454 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039011 A2 20000927; EP 1039011 A3 20010411; EP 1039011 B1 20041103; CN 1135274 C 20040121; CN 1268589 A 20001004; KR 100665546 B1 20070109; KR 20010014617 A 20010226; TW 509738 B 20021111; US 6543580 B1 20030408

INPADOC legal status

2009-12-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070324

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070324

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070324

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-09-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GRAF & CO. GMBH TECHNOLOGIE SERVICE

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI