Global Patent Index - EP 1039016 A2

EP 1039016 A2 2000-09-27 - Apparatus and method for counting textile articles, such as stockings, socks, Pantyhose articles and the like

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for counting textile articles, such as stockings, socks, Pantyhose articles and the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Zählen von Textilartikeln, wie Strumpfwaren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour compter les articles textiles, comme les bas, les chaussettes, collants ou analogues

Publication

EP 1039016 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830176 A

Priority

IT FI990059 A

Abstract (en)

APPARATUS FOR COUNTING TEXTILE ARTICLES COMPRISING: A BODY (1) HAVING A TUBULAR OR SUBSTANTIALLY TUBULAR STRUCTURE; AN ASPIRATOR (AS) TO WHICH SAID BODY (1) IS ASSOCIATED, THE ASPIRATOR (AS) ACTING FOR PRODUCING AN AIR FLOW DIRECTED FROM THE INLET SECTION (I) TO THE OUTLET SECTION (U) OF THE BODY (1); A STATION FOR TEMPORARILY STOPPING THE ARTICLES (2) TO BE CONTROLLED WITHIN SAID BODY (1); A PLURALITY OF OPTICAL ELEMENTS (3a, 3b, 3n) DISPOSED IN CORRESPONDENCE OF SAID STATION (C). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06H 3/16; D05B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06M 7/00 (2006.01); D05B 23/00 (2006.01); D06H 3/16 (2006.01); G06M 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 23/007 (2013.01); D06H 3/165 (2013.01); G06M 1/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039016 A2 20000927; EP 1039016 A3 20010321; IT 1307853 B1 20011119; IT FI990059 A1 20000925; IT FI990059 D0 19990323; JP 2000311235 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06H 3/16 A, 7D 05B 23/00 B, 7G 06M 1/10 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI