Global Patent Index - EP 1039018 A1

EP 1039018 A1 2000-09-27 - Method of treating textile products and textiles products thus treated

Title (en)

Method of treating textile products and textiles products thus treated

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von Textilprodukten und damit behandelte Textilprodukte

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de produits textiles et produits textiles ainsi traités

Publication

EP 1039018 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110985 A

Priority

  • EP 95903962 A
  • JP 35361393 A

Abstract (en)

A fiber is firstly treated with a carboxylic acid-metal complex obtained from a metal salt and a carboxylic acid in a first stage, and then treated with a usual fluorine-containing water- and oil-repellent in a second stage. According to the present invention, the water-repellency which is durable to washing and friction is imparted to a textile, and the touch, the feeling and the flexibility of the textile itself are not deteriorated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 13/292; D06M 13/184; D06M 13/188; D06M 13/203; D06M 13/213; D06M 13/224; D06M 13/428; D06M 15/277; D06M 15/576

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/256 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/184 (2006.01); D06M 13/188 (2006.01); D06M 13/203 (2006.01); D06M 13/213 (2006.01); D06M 13/224 (2006.01); D06M 13/244 (2006.01); D06M 13/282 (2006.01); D06M 13/292 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/428 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01); D06M 15/576 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/2035 (2013.01); D06M 13/1845 (2013.01); D06M 13/188 (2013.01); D06M 13/213 (2013.01); D06M 13/224 (2013.01); D06M 13/2243 (2013.01); D06M 13/292 (2013.01); D06M 13/428 (2013.01); D06M 15/277 (2013.01); D06M 15/576 (2013.01); D06M 2101/06 (2013.01); D06M 2101/12 (2013.01); D06M 2101/32 (2013.01); D06M 2101/34 (2013.01); D06M 2200/11 (2013.01); D06M 2200/12 (2013.01); D06M 2200/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737773 A1 19961016; EP 0737773 A4 19980610; EP 0737773 B1 20020626; AT 219804 T 20020715; CN 1096522 C 20021218; CN 1139965 A 19970108; DE 69430873 D1 20020801; DE 69430873 T2 20021128; EP 1039018 A1 20000927; JP H07197377 A 19950801; WO 9518258 A1 19950706

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020923

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-09-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 737773

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE