Global Patent Index - EP 1039020 A1

EP 1039020 A1 2000-09-27 - Process for bleaching lignocellulosic pulp

Title (en)

Process for bleaching lignocellulosic pulp

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bleichen von lignocellulosischem Zellstoff

Title (fr)

Procede de blanchiment de pate lignocellulosique

Publication

EP 1039020 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00302354 A

Priority

  • JP 7754999 A
  • JP 22906899 A

Abstract (en)

Lignocellulose pulp is bleached by bleaching a pulp in aqueous alkali solution with oxygen and treating the pulp with an enzyme, while a liquid fraction delivered from the enzyme treatment step is subjected to a penetration treatment through a separation membrane, for example, reverse osmosis membrane, to separate a permeated fraction from a non-permeated fraction; the permeated fraction is fed to the alkali-oxygen bleaching (oxygen delignification) step and is used as a liquid medium of the bleaching system; and non-permeated fraction is subjected to a xylooligosaccharide-collecting procedure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/00 (2006.01); D21C 9/147 (2006.01); D21C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/005 (2013.01); D21C 9/147 (2013.01); D21C 11/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039020 A1 20000927; EP 1039020 B1 20040218; CA 2301371 A1 20000923; CA 2301371 C 20090901; CA 2627846 A1 20000923; CA 2627846 C 20110104; EP 1304412 A2 20030423; EP 1304412 A3 20030625; EP 1304412 B1 20050914

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090322

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-04-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FI SE

2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020614

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FI SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FI SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI