Global patent index - EP 1039021 A1

EP 1039021 A1 2000-09-27 - Method for wet screening fibrous suspensions in pressure screens and pressure screen

Title (en)

Method for wet screening fibrous suspensions in pressure screens and pressure screen

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Nasssieben von Faserstoffsuspensionen in Drucksortierern und Drucksortierersieb

Title (fr)

Procédé de tammisage humide de suspensions fibreuses dans des tamis sous pression et tamis sous pression

Publication

EP 1039021 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103284 A

Priority

  • DE 19913515 A
  • DE 19916038 A

Abstract (en)

The sieve, to sort a paper fiber suspension or separate it into fractions in a pressure sorting assembly, has an entry side which is structured so that the flow direction of the stripping eddy is reversed by the backflow. The backflow flushes the part of the sieve between the sieve opening and its adjacent downstream opening. A part of the fiber suspension flows through the sieve openings and the other part flows over them. The relative movements of the sieve cleaner generate pressure or suction bursts at the sieve openings to give flows forwards and backwards. The backflows are deflected on leaving the sieve openings to reverse the flow direction following the surface of the stripping eddy. The backflow wholly flushes the sieve openings between them and the neighboring downstream openings. The sieve openings are sorting slits (3), with their longitudinal extension across the direction (R) of cleaner movement. The axis of the developed stripping eddy is parallel to the sorting slit (3). The flushing of the sieve is at the side of it towards the cleaner. An Independent claim is included for a fiber suspension sorting sieve where the end surfaces (4) between the sorting slits (3) are extended (6) at the trailing ends (8), to cover the leading ends (7) of the neighboring end surfaces (4) by a length (b) of at least 0.5 mm or at least 1.0 mm. The leading end of the end surfaces and the under side of the extensions (6) over them are at an angle ( alpha ) of 3-45 degrees to each other, and pref. 5-25 degrees . The extensions (6) are at the end surfaces (4) at the entry side, where the suspension flows into the sorting slits when the pressure sorter is working. The trailing end is at the side of the end surface (4) which is downstream in relation to the fiber suspension flow (R) in operation. The end surfaces (4) are pitched against the sieve surface (5') at an angle ( beta ) of 5-50 degrees and pref. 10-30 degrees . The under side (9) of the end surface extension (6) is at an angle to the sieve surface (5') of 2-40 degrees and pref. 5-25 degrees . The end surface (4) has no edges which would form an additional build-up when the sieve is in operation. The sorting slits (3) are formed between profiled rods (2) mounted in reinforcements (1). The reinforcements (1) have recesses to hold the rods (2) by tension, as they are distorted on fitting the rods and reassert against them. The reinforcements (1) are rings, to give a cylindrical sieve structure, or the reinforcements (1) and rods (2) are on parallel planes to form a flat sieve. The under sides (9) of the end side extensions (6) have a number of spacer projections distributed over their length, supported by the neighboring end surfaces. The extensions (6) range generally over the whole length of the sorting slits (3). The extensions (6) can be divided a number of times along the sorting slits (3), and they can have an irregular shape along the slits (3). The sieve opening width (w) is 0.08-2.0 mm. The sorting slits (3) have a length which does not exceed 10 mm.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren ist für das Sortieren oder Fraktionieren von Faserstoffsuspensionen bestimmt. Ein geeignetes Drucksortierersieb weist eine Vielzahl von parallel ausgerichteten Sortierschlitzen (3) auf. Zwischen den Sortierschlitzen (3) liegen Stirnflächen (4) mit jeweils einem vorderen Abschluss (7) und einem hinteren Abschluss (8). Der hintere Abschluss (8) ist mit einer Verlängerung (6) versehen, die den Sortierschlitz (3) und die benachbarte Stirnfläche (4) teilweise abdeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21D 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21D 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039021 A1 20000927; EP 1039021 B1 20040421; AT 264940 T 20040515; US 6273266 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130218

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 264940

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50006113

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120218

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120219

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006113

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030109

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI FR IT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI