Global patent index - EP 1039025 A1

EP 1039025 A1 2000-09-27 - Sheet having a skin touch, printable at high rate, process for making the same, and packaging made therewith

Title (en)

Sheet having a skin touch, printable at high rate, process for making the same, and packaging made therewith

Title (de)

Hochrate bedruckbares Blatt mit einem Hautgefühl, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, und damit hergestellte Verpackung

Title (fr)

Feuille avec un touché peau imprimable à des cadences élevées et son procédé de fabrication et emballage la comportant

Publication

EP 1039025 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400828 A

Priority

FR 9903837 A

Abstract (en)

The wrapping paper has a right surface with a skin feel, which can be printed at high speeds. It has a support paper material with a surface covering of at least expanded thermoplastic micro-spheres and a bonding agent forming the right paper surface. The paper has a static friction coefficient between the right and left surfaces of 0.95 and pref. 0.90. The paper weight is 70-500 g/m<2> and pref. 200-400 g/m<2>. The support paper is transparent or translucent, and especially a tracing paper, pref. from pressure refining of cellulose fibers. The covering layer on the right surface has a weight of 6-20 g/m<2> and pref. 8-17 g/m<2>. The covering layer is composed of 5-12 dry wt% of expanded thermoplastic micro-spheres and pref. 6-9 wt%, 15-95 dry wt% of a bonding agent with a glazing temp. of (-) 10 degrees C to (+) 35 degrees and pref. 20-40 wt%, 0-75 dry wt% of mineral pigments and pref. 40-75 wt% and 0-40 dry wt% of dyestuff, to give a total of 100 wt%. The expanded thermoplastic micro-spheres contain a gas, which expands at a temp. of 90-115 degrees C and pref. 100-110 degrees C. The surface covering has a low friction component in a distribution of 0.1-5.0 g/m<2> and pref. 0.3-3.0 g/m<2>. At least one surface contains a salt which can be ionized, and particularly sodium chloride. The support paper has a coloring at least under the layer of micro-spheres and/or a layer and/or a print which can be seen through the layer. An Independent claim is included for a paper prodn. process where the support paper is formed from a cellulose fiber suspension in water together with synthetic fibers if required. It is mixed with minerals, at least one bonding agent and a dye, an agent to resist moisture and other conventional papermaking additives. The left surface of the paper is coated with a material to reduce friction, and the paper is dried at 100 degrees C. The right surface of the paper is coated with a mixture of thermoplastic micro-spheres together with a bonding agent and mineral pigments and dyestuff. The coated paper is heated at 90-115 degrees C to dry the paper and expand the micro-spheres and pref. 100-110 degrees C. The paper is wound into a roll. Preferred Features: The low friction coating is applied by a glue press using a double-sided transfer film and the drying is through an air cushion. The cellulose fibers are refined to a high state and pref. 90 degrees SR. A further Independent claim is included for a wrapping process where the paper is drawn off the roll and cut into sheets in the required format. The sheets are printed at a speed of 8000 sheets/hr., and the printed sheets are cut to size. An adhesive is applied to either surface where the wrapping is to be secured. The products are wrapped, with the layer containing the expanded thermoplastic micro-spheres on the outer side.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une feuille présentant sur l'une de ces faces un toucher, dite face recto, rappelant la peau et étant imprimable à des cadences élevées, comportant une feuille support étant revêtue sur l'une de ces faces d'une couche comportant au moins des microsphères thermoplastiques expansées et un liant, formant ladite face recto, et ladite feuille ayant un coefficient de friction statique entre cette dite face recto et l'autre face verso inférieur à 0,95, de préférence inférieur ou égal à 0,90, mesure faite selon la norme NF-Q-03-082 avec un patin de 200g. L'invention concerne aussi son procédé de fabrication, son utilisation, l'emballage obtenu avec cette feuille ainsi que le procédé de fabrication de l'emballage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/54; B65D 65/42; D21H 19/44; D21H 19/84; D21H 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/44 (2006.01); D21H 19/84 (2006.01); D21H 21/54 (2006.01); D21H 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/84 (2013.01); D21H 19/44 (2013.01); D21H 21/54 (2013.01); D21H 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039025 A1 20000927; EP 1039025 B1 20101215; AT 491842 T 20110115; DE 60045353 D1 20110127; ES 2354243 T3 20110311; FR 2791368 A1 20000929; FR 2791368 B1 20010601; PT 1039025 E 20110105

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60045353

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110916

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110916

2011-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ARJOWIGGINS RIVES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-07-06 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-04-06 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: VDEP

- Effective date: 20101215

2011-03-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60045353

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2011-01-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2011-01-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2011-01-05 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2010-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARJOWIGGINS RIVES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040407

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARJO WIGGINS DESSIN ET PAPIERS FINS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000408

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI