Global Patent Index - EP 1039040 A1

EP 1039040 A1 2000-09-27 - Attachment fixture of power shovel

Title (en)

Attachment fixture of power shovel

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für eine Baggerschaufel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour un godet d'excavatrice

Publication

EP 1039040 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99122762 A

Priority

JP 7723299 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a fixture used when an operation attachment of various type is mounted to a power shovel, and the invention provides an attachment fixture capable of being used generally for various power shovels and attachments having different diameters and mounting widths of mounting pins. The attachment fixture comprises a body (34) for connecting an attachment (17) to an arm (11) and afront link (12) of the power shovel, a spacer 35 interposed in a gap formed between the body and the attachment, and/or a spacer (37) interposed in a gap formed between the body and the arm as well as the front link. Each of the spacers (35, 37) is formed into a cylindrical shape, a cylindrical shape having a flange, or a disk-like shape with a center hole (36, 38) having the same diameters as those of mounting pins or those of the connection pins 13, 14 connecting with the power shovel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/36 (2006.01); E02F 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/3613 (2013.01); E02F 3/3618 (2013.01); E02F 3/3668 (2013.01); E02F 3/3672 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039040 A1 20000927; JP 2000273893 A 20001003; US 2001050326 A1 20011213

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070111

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI