Global Patent Index - EP 1039048 A2

EP 1039048 A2 2000-09-27 - Toilet cistern

Title (en)

Toilet cistern

Title (de)

Toilettenspülkasten

Title (fr)

Réservoir de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 1039048 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105830 A

Priority

DE 29905023 U

Abstract (en)

The cistern, for a flush lavatory toilet, has wall insulation for mounting in or in front of a wall. The cistern has a double-shell structure with an outer (31) and inner (32) shell. The gap between the shells (31,32) is filled with an insulation material (33). The cistern, for a flush lavatory toilet, has wall insulation for mounting in or in front of a wall. The cistern has a double-shell structure with an outer (31) and inner (32) shell. The gap between the shells (31,32) is filled with an insulation material (33). The insulation is of mixed recycled plastics material using 90% polyolefins and 10% of other materials, with can be foamed with a foaming agent while injection into the hollow space. The insulation can also be of various waste thermoplastic foam materials

Abstract (de)

Ein Toilettenspülkasten mit Wandisolierung zur Montage vor oder in der Wand, wobei die Spülkastenwand doppelschalig, bestehend aus einer Außenschale (31) und einer Innenschale (32), ausgeführt ist und wobei im Hohlraum zwischen der Außenschale (31) und der Innenschale (32) Isoliermaterial (33) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905023 U1 20000420; EP 1039048 A2 20000927; EP 1039048 A3 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI