Global patent index - EP 1039050 A2

EP 1039050 A2 2000-09-27 - Multifunction flush tank control device

Title (en)

Multifunction flush tank control device

Title (de)

Multifunktionale Kontrollvorrichtung für eine Toilettenspülung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle polyvalent pour une chasse d'eau de toilettes

Publication

EP 1039050 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106132 A

Priority

IT TO990220 A

Abstract (en)

A control device (1) for a flush tank (2), wherein a discharge valve (18), having at least one lift lever (20), is activated by means of at least one operating push-button (6, 7) carried by a plate (5); the action of the operating push-button (6, 7) is transmitted to the lift lever (20) by a rocking body (28) of a control member (23) hinged to a frame (4), and by a corresponding connecting arm (22); and the connecting arm (22) is clicked onto the rocking body (28) by inserting an end head (24) of the connecting arm inside a respective seat on the rocking body (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 5/02; E03D 1/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01); E03D 5/092 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/028 (2013.01); E03D 1/012 (2013.01); E03D 5/092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039050 A2 20000927; EP 1039050 A3 20010307; IT 1308826 B1 20020111; IT TO990220 A1 20000922

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051115

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI