Global patent index - EP 1039052 A2

EP 1039052 A2 2000-09-27 - Method for cleaning a collecting tank for fluids, a collecting tank and a flushing drum

Title (en)

Method for cleaning a collecting tank for fluids, a collecting tank and a flushing drum

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen eines Flüssigkeitsspeicherraums, Flüssigkeitsspeicherraum und Spültrommel

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la nettoyage d'un réservoir de stockage pour liquides, un réservoir de stockage pour liquides et un tambour de rinçage

Publication

EP 1039052 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104849 A

Priority

DE 19912724 A

Abstract (en)

The method for cleaning a fluid accumulation chamber with a main basin and a pre-chamber (12) fitted to the main basin (14) via a through passage (16). A flushing tip surface (20) is provided in the main basin. In the pre-chamber is a water build-up (W1) for flood-flushing of the main basin and the flushing tip surface is filled with water overflowing from the pre-chamber for flushing the main basin.

Abstract (de)

Erfindungsgemäß wird vorgeschlagen, zur Reinigung eines Flüssigkeitsspeicherraums mit einem Hauptbecken (14), einer dem Hauptbecken (14) über einen Durchlaß (16) zugeordneten Vorkammer (12) und einer Spülkippe (20) in dem Hauptbecken (14) in der Vorkammer (12) einen Wasservorrat (W1) zum Schwallspülen des Hauptbeckens (14) aufzustauen und die Spülkippe (20) mit aus der Vorkammer (12) überlaufendem Wasser (W') zum Spülen des Hauptbeckens (14) zu befüllen. Ein Flüssigkeitsspeicherraum, insbesondere Regenüberlaufbecken, verfügt hierzu über ein Hauptbecken (14), eine dem Hauptbecken (14) über einen Durchlaß (16) zugeordnete Vorkammer (12) und eine Spüleinrichtung, die bei steigendem Wasserstand in der Vorkammer (12) schwimmergesteuert ein zumindest teilweises Schließen des Durchlasses (16) bewirkt und eine Überlaufschwelle (18) zwischen Vorkammer (12) und Hauptbecken(14) mit nachgeordneter Spülkippe (20) in dem Hauptbecken (14) umfaßt, wobei die Spülkippe (20) schwimmergesteuert lösbar arretiert ist und nach Befüllen der Spülkippe (20) über die Überlaufschwelle (18) zunächst eine Spülung des Hauptbeckens (14) durch Öffnen des Durchlasses (16) und nach Absinken des Wasserstandes in der Vorkammer (12) auf eine vorbestimmte Höhe eine Spülung durch Lösen der Arretierung der Spülkippe (20) erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/105 (2013.01); E03F 5/107 (2013.01); E03F 9/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039052 A2 20000927; EP 1039052 A3 20010221; EP 1039052 B1 20030611; AT 242828 T 20030615; DE 19912724 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130307

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50002512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50002512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120308

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110307

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100311

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50002512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI LU

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI LU

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI LU

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI