Global Patent Index - EP 1039054 A3

EP 1039054 A3 2002-09-11 - Method and device for cleaning a fluid receptacle

Title (en)

Method and device for cleaning a fluid receptacle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinhaltung eines Flüssigkeitsbehälters

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour nettoyer un réservoir de liquide

Publication

EP 1039054 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105802 A

Priority

DE 19913499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039054A2] The ventilation and/or cleaning process for tanks for fluids containing solids. One or more rotary pumps (2) supply a fluid flow into the tank via several injection nozzles (10) with shut-off devices positioned in front. Individual shut-off devices are opened and closed by a regulator unit in a pattern dependent upon the requirements of the installation, so that individual fluid jets are directed into the tank one after the other. Rotary pumps and/or shut-off devices are regulated via a computer program.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/10; B08B 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/093 (2006.01); E03F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/105 (2013.01); B08B 9/0933 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039054 A2 20000927; EP 1039054 A3 20020911; EP 1039054 B1 20070509; AT 362021 T 20070615; DE 19913499 A1 20000928; DE 50014311 D1 20070621

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180403

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KSB SE & CO. KGAA, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KSB AG, 67227 FRANKENTHAL, DE

- Document: DE 50014311

2008-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080212

2007-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014311 P 20070621

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB NL

2007-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING A BASIN

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050715

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB NL

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 03F 5/10 A, 7B 08B 9/093 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI