Global Patent Index - EP 1039060 A2

EP 1039060 A2 2000-09-27 - Method and system for making prefabricated structural grid-like panels for making buildings

Title (en)

Method and system for making prefabricated structural grid-like panels for making buildings

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Herstellung vorgefertigter gitterartiger Bauelemente zum Errichten von Gebäuden

Title (fr)

Procédé et système pour la fabrication de panneaux en forme de grille pour la construction des batiments

Publication

EP 1039060 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99110462 A

Priority

IT MI990620 A

Abstract (en)

A system for making prefabricated structural grid-like panels for making buildings provides to use a pair of rollers which can be moved toward one another in order to press therebetween a preformed panel comprising a top net sheet and a bottom net sheet, therebetween an insulating material is arranged. As the net sheets are pressed, cross members of said sheets penetrate the insulating material to project from the opposite side thereof, thereby the cross members can be welded on wires of the corresponding net sheet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039060 A2 20000927; EP 1039060 A3 20030129; IT 1312155 B1 20020409; IT MI990620 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040207

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04C 2/06 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04C 2/20 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 21F 27/12 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI