Global Patent Index - EP 1039062 A2

EP 1039062 A2 2000-09-27 - A glass brick assembly

Title (en)

A glass brick assembly

Title (de)

Element aus Glasbausteinen

Title (fr)

Elément en briques de verre

Publication

EP 1039062 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301736 A

Priority

AU PP905699 A

Abstract (en)

A method of forming a glass brick assembly (10) from a plurality of glass bricks (11), said method including the steps of providing upstanding end frame members (13) for defining the boundaries of said assembly (10), providing separation strips (21) for location between adjacent courses of bricks (11), providing connectors at each end of said separation strips for connecting said separation strips (21) to said end frame members (13), and the end frame members (13) having locators locating each said connector with its adjacent end frame member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039062 A2 20000927; EP 1039062 A3 20030129; AU PP905699 D0 19990325; NZ 503109 A 20011026

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04C 2/54 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04C 1/42 B

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EURO-GLASHAUS, S.L

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI