Global patent index - EP 1039065 A2

EP 1039065 A2 2000-09-27 - Improvements in panelling

Title (en)

Improvements in panelling

Title (de)

Verbesserung in Paneelen

Title (fr)

Amélioration dans des panneaux

Publication

EP 1039065 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100860 A

Priority

GB 9906482 A

Abstract (en)

The invention discloses a method of cutting a door panel having an appropriately spaced and repeating panel therein to provide wainscoting panels for use above inclined skirting boards of the type which are found adjacent staircases in houses. The door panel is cut along lines which bisect but do not interfere with the repeating pattern elements, which may be rectangular and stand proud of the surface of the door panel, said cut lines being diagonally inclined with respect to the substantially straight long edges of the door panel. The diagonal cuts are staggered above and below each specific pattern element, of which there are usually two adjacently disposed on the door panel, further cuts being made between and on either side of the specific pattern elements substantially parallel to the straight long edges of the door panel. In this manner, two substantially identically parallelogram-shaped wainscoting panels are obtained, the angle of inclination of the shorter sides being substantially equal to the angle of inclination of a modern domestic staircase. This allows said wainscoting panels to be simply mounted on the top edge of the inclined skirting board with their upper shorter edges being automatically aligned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039065 A2 20000927; EP 1039065 A3 20010919; GB 9906482 D0 19990512

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CUTTING EDGE (HULL) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAMBOARD HOLDINGS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TENNISON TIMBER LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04F 13/10 A, 7B 44C 5/04 B, 7B 44C 3/12 B, 7B 27M 3/00 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI