Global Patent Index - EP 1039073 A1

EP 1039073 A1 2000-09-27 - Reinforced cylinder for a lock

Title (en)

Reinforced cylinder for a lock

Title (de)

Verstärkter Zylinder für ein Schloss

Title (fr)

Cylindre renforcé pour serrure

Publication

EP 1039073 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420050 A

Priority

FR 9903995 A

Abstract (en)

Main cylinder body (C) has two tubular elements (4 a, b) placed on either side of transversal plane (P). Web (6) moves in gap (5) between those element, and is attached to cylindrical sleeve (7). Tubular elements are linked to each other with longitudinal strap (10) with longitudinal groove (12). Link is ensured by radial screws (13).

Abstract (fr)

Dans ce cylindre, le corps cylindrique axial (7,7a,7e), portant les moyens d'actionnement (6,6a,43a,43b,45) du mécanisme d'une serrure, dépasse longitudinalement vers l'extérieur de chacune des portées (8) dans lesquelles il est monté libre en rotation et chacune de ses extrémités est munie d'un moyen de calage en translation longitudinale (14,50), apte à coopérer avec une face d'appui (16,52) du corps du cylindre (4a,4b), l'un au moins de ces moyens de calage (14,50) étant constitués par un jonc élastique (14) engagé dans une gorge extérieure (15), ménagée à l'une des extrémités du corps cylindrique (7,7a à 7e). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/20; E05B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 9/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/10 (2013.01); E05B 9/045 (2013.01); E05B 17/042 (2013.01); E05B 17/2084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039073 A1 20000927; FR 2791380 A1 20000929; FR 2791380 B1 20010622

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040127

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH IT LI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH IT LI

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI