Global Patent Index - EP 1039075 A2

EP 1039075 A2 2000-09-27 - Electronic locking system, in particular vehicle locking system

Title (en)

Electronic locking system, in particular vehicle locking system

Title (de)

Elektronische Schliessanlage, insbesondere Fahrzeugschliessanlage

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage électronique, notamment système de verrouillage d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1039075 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103504 A

Priority

DE 19912319 A

Abstract (en)

The system has one or more closure units, at least one user-carried authentication element and a closure control arrangement with an authentication element detector and distance detector for detecting the distance of the authentication element from the object (2). The closure control arrangement generates different closure control commands for an authenticated authentication element depending in whether it is close to or far from the object.

Abstract (de)

Elektronische Schließanlage mit einer oder mehreren, jeweils an einem zu sichernden Öffnungselement eines Objektes angeordneten, ver- und entriegelbaren Schließeinheiten, wenigstens einem berechtigenden Authentikationselement und Schließsteuermitteln mit wenigstens einem Authentikationselement-Erkennungssensor mit vorgegebenem, objektaußenseitig eine Außenerfassungszone abdeckendem Erfassungsbereich, wobei die Schließsteuermittel unterschiedliche ver- und entriegelungsbezogene Schließsteuerbefehle in Abhängigkeit davon erzeugen, ob und in welcher Außenerfassungszone sie ein berechtigendes Authentikationselement erkennen. Erfindungsgemäß beinhalten die Schließsteuermittel eine Sensorik zur Bestimmung der Entfernung eines erkannten Authentikationselementes vom Objekt und erzeugen bei Erkennung eines berechtigenden Authentikationselementes selbsttätig für die jeweilige Schließeinheit unterschiedliche Schließsteuerbefehle in Abhängigkeit davon, in welcher Entfernung zum Objekt sich das erkannte Authentikationselement befindet. Verwendung z.B. für Automobile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00; B60R 25/00; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2209/63 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039075 A2 20000927; EP 1039075 A3 20040310; DE 19912319 C1 20001012; JP 2000297569 A 20001024; JP 3552985 B2 20040811; US 6700475 B1 20040302

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071127

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070727

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2004-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040206

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07C 9/00 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 49/00 B

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 25/00 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI