Global Patent Index - EP 1039079 A1

EP 1039079 A1 2000-09-27 - Lock for a motor vehicle wing

Title (en)

Lock for a motor vehicle wing

Title (de)

Schloss für Kraftfahrzeugflügel

Title (fr)

Serrure pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1039079 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400774 A

Priority

FR 9903569 A

Abstract (en)

On side of medium plane of bolt (5) and catch (4) where plate (2) of module is not placed, crossbar (6) is placed and has two collars (64, 65), with inner thread. Distance between centers of collars (64, 65) is equal to distance between centers of collars (24, 25) of plate so that screwing of screws (10) inside crossbar collars applies plate against edge (1) of mobile lift. Crossbar is then obstacle against sliding of medium plane of bolt relative to medium plane of catch.

Abstract (fr)

La serrure comporte un pêne (5) rotatif, en forme de fourche, le pêne (5) étant retenu en position fermée par un cliquet (4) pivotant, le pêne (5) et le cliquet (4) étant renfermés à l'intérieur d'un module, qui comporte extérieurement une platine (2) appliquée et fixée sur le chant (1) du battant mobile par des vis (10). La serrure comporte, en outre, une enveloppe renfermant l'ensemble de son mécanisme et coopérant avec ledit module pour assurer la commande du cliquet. Le pêne (5) et le cliquet (4) sont axés chacun sur un collet (25, 24) de la platine (2), lesdits collets (25, 24) étant traversés chacun par l'une des vis (10) de fixation du module sur le chant (1) du battant mobile. Du côté du plan moyen du pêne (5) et du cliquet (4) où ne se trouve pas la platine (2) du module, est disposée une traverse (6) qui comporte au moins deux collets (65, 64) taraudés intérieurement, l'entre-axe des collets (65, 64) de traverse (6) étant égal à l'entre-axe des collets (25, 24) de platine (2) de façon que le vissage des vis (10) dans les collets (65, 64) entraîne l'application de la platine (2) contre le chant (1) du battant mobile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32; E05B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/32 (2006.01); E05B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/10 (2013.01); E05B 85/02 (2013.01); E05B 85/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039079 A1 20000927; EP 1039079 B1 20040721; DE 60012253 D1 20040826; DE 60012253 T2 20050908; FR 2791386 A1 20000929; FR 2791386 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 60012253

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012253

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012253

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070321

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060301

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070321

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-11-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012253 P 20040826

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI