Global Patent Index - EP 1039095 A3

EP 1039095 A3 2001-04-11 - Downhole drill bit

Title (en)

Downhole drill bit

Title (de)

Bohrmeissel

Title (fr)

Trépan de forage

Publication

EP 1039095 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302231 A

Priority

US 12511999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039095A2] A downhole tool has a body defining a proximal end for connection to a drill string and a distal end which defines a pilot section and an intermediate reamer section. Both the pilot and the reamer sections define cutting surfaces. The body defines a rotational diameter and a smaller pass-through diameter. Stabilizing means arc coupled to the body opposite either the reamer or the pilot section . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/26; E21B 10/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/26 (2006.01); E21B 10/42 (2006.01); E21B 10/43 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/43 (2013.01); E21B 10/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0058061 A2 19820818 - DRILLING & SERVICE UK LTD [GB]
  • [Y] GB 2317632 A 19980401 - SMITH INTERNATIONAL [US]
  • [A] US 5765653 A 19980616 - DOSTER MICHAEL L [US], et al
  • [A] US 5678644 A 19971021 - FIELDER COY [US]
  • [A] FR 1249499 A 19601230 - EUROP DE TURBOFORAGE SOC
  • [A] CSONKA, G. ET AL.: "Ream While Drilling Technology Applied Succesfully Offshore Australia", SPE36990, 28 October 1996 (1996-10-28), Adelaide, pages 271 - 278, XP002153941
  • [A] ROTHE J R ET AL: "REAM-WHILE-DRILLING TOOL CUTS COSTS OF THREE VENEZUELAN WELLS", OIL AND GAS JOURNAL,US,PENNWELL PUBLISHING CO. TULSA, vol. 95, no. 2, 13 January 1997 (1997-01-13), pages 33 - 34,36,38-40, XP000685109, ISSN: 0030-1388
  • [T] "Hughes Christensen's Drill Out RWD tool", INTERNET ARTICLE, XP002154028, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.bakerhughes.com/hcc/holeopen/dosrwd.htm> [retrieved on 20001128]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039095 A2 20000927; EP 1039095 A3 20010411; EP 1039095 B1 20050518; DE 60020185 D1 20050623; DE 60020185 T2 20060112

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-09-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020185 P 20050623

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DIAMOND PRODUCTS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2001-03-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DIAMOND PRODUCTIONS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 10/26 A, 7E 21B 10/56 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI