Global Patent Index - EP 1039103 A2

EP 1039103 A2 2000-09-27 - Device for modifying the valve lift in an engine cylinder head

Title (en)

Device for modifying the valve lift in an engine cylinder head

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Hubverstellung eines Gaswechselventils im Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour varier la levée de soupape dans une culasse de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1039103 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104801 A

Priority

DE 19913742 A

Abstract (en)

The device incorporates a pivot lever (7), which executes pivot movements due to a cam (12) and a return spring (14), and is guided by a link lever (16). This moves coaxially to the rotary axis (15) of the regulator shaft. Its link point on the pivot lever is defined by a crossing point of two circular arcs about the end points of a fictional curve of the rotary axis. With an imaginary four-bar linkage (a,b,c) with 'b' corresponding to the pivot lever, the fictional curve serves as kinematically equivalent replacement for the actual displacement of the cam disc (9) for the empty stroke curve. The end points (20,20') of this curve determine the centers of the fictional curve.

Abstract (de)

Für eine Vorrichtung zur Hubverstellung eines Gaswechselventils im Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine, bei der ein gesteuert verstellbarer Schwenkhebel über eine eine Leerhubkurve und eine Hubkurve umfassenden Steuerbahn mittels eines Übertragungselementes auf ein Gaswechselventil einwirkt, wird zur Erzielung einer bauraumsparenden Konstruktion vorgeschlagen, daß der Schwenkhebel in seinen von einem Nocken einer Nockenwelle und einer Rückstellfeder bewirkten Schwenkbewegungen mittels eines koaxial zur Drehachse einer eine Kurvenscheibe zur Hubverstellung tragenden Steuerwelle drehbeweglich gelagerten Anlenkhebels geführt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0063 (2013.01); F01L 1/185 (2013.01); F01L 1/2405 (2013.01); F01L 2013/0068 (2013.01); F01L 2105/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039103 A2 20000927; EP 1039103 A3 20010926; EP 1039103 B1 20041013; DE 19913742 A1 20000928; ES 2224939 T3 20050316

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110218

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050306

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224939 T3

2005-03-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2005-03-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008179 P 20041118

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLACHTER, ROLF,DR.

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOLLWECK, ANTON

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI