Global Patent Index - EP 1039105 A3

EP 1039105 A3 2001-03-07 - Exhaust system for internal combustion engines, particularly for vehicles

Title (en)

Exhaust system for internal combustion engines, particularly for vehicles

Title (de)

Abgasanlage für Brennkraftmaschinen, insbesondere für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système d'échappement pour moteurs à combustion interne, en particulier pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1039105 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00103987 A

Priority

DE 19912330 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039105A2] The exhaust gas system for an internal combustion motor, and especially for a vehicle, has a measurement probe in the cross section of the exhaust pipe (1) in the exhaust gas flow, with a downstream condensation water trap (2) in the exhaust pipe (1). The condensation water trap (2) is formed at the connecting zone by pipe sections (3,4) pushed into each other, of different dias. to form a ring zone (5) as the condensation water trap (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/00; F01N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/00 (2010.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/08 (2013.01); F01N 13/008 (2013.01); F01N 2240/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5133185 A 19920728 - GILBREATH JERRY W [US], et al
  • [Y] US 3114617 A 19631217 - ROWE LESTER M, et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 04 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912330 A1 20000921; EP 1039105 A2 20000927; EP 1039105 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI