Global patent index - EP 1039118 A2

EP 1039118 A2 2000-09-27 - Cylinder block for a piston engine

Title (en)

Cylinder block for a piston engine

Title (de)

Zylinderblock für einen Kolbenmotor

Title (fr)

Bloc-cylindres pour un moteur à pistons

Publication

EP 1039118 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105442 A

Priority

DE 19912692 A

Abstract (en)

The cylinder block has at least one cylinder liner (2) and cast-in thrust bearings (4) extending from the crankshaft bearing blocks (7) to the support surface (6) of a cylinder head. The thrust bearings are of a light metal alloy, which has higher heat and fatigue resistance and a lower heat expansion coefficient than the cylinder block alloy. The bearings accommodate the bearings screws for cylinder head and crankshaft, or continuous tension rods. The crankshaft bearing blocks are of the same alloy as the thrust bearings, e.g. an alloy with a high silicon and/or iron, copper, nickel content, and with particle or fiber reinforcement. Manufacture is by sintering or cutting sections off an extruded profile.

Abstract (de)

Zylinderblock aus einer Leichtmetallegierung für einen Kolbenmotor mit wenigstens einer Zylinderlaufbuchse und eingegossenen, von den Kurbelwellenlagerböcken bis zur Auflagefläche eines Zylinderkopfs reichenden Lagerstühlen aus einer gegenüber der Zylinderblocklegierung eine höhere Warmfestigkeit und Dauerfestigkeit sowie einen niedrigeren Wärmedehnungskoeffizienten aufweisenden Leichtmetallegierung, die die Zylinderkopf- und Kurbelwellenlagerschrauben oder durchgehende Zuganker aufnehmen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F02B 75/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/221 (2013.01); F02B 75/224 (2013.01); F02F 7/0053 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0436 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0439 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039118 A2 20000927; EP 1039118 A3 20010718; EP 1039118 B1 20050713; DE 19912692 A1 20000928; DE 19912692 C2 20001228

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160315

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50010690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150401

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50010690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BUNGARTZ CHRISTOPHERSEN PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATE, DE

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARTINREA HONSEL GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50010690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50010690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BUNGARTZ CHRISTOPHERSEN PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041122

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011117

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02F 7/00 A, 7F 02B 75/22 B, 7B 22D 19/00 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI