Global Patent Index - EP 1039121 A2

EP 1039121 A2 2000-09-27 - Fuel pump

Title (en)

Fuel pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoff-Förderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à carburant

Publication

EP 1039121 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105811 A

Priority

DE 19913804 A

Abstract (en)

Two rotating, self-engaging cogwheels (15,16) in a pump chamber (19) feed fuel into a pressurized area linked to a fuel injection pump (1) from an inlet area connected to a reservoir along a feed channel between the cogwheel face surfaces and the pump chamber perimeter side. One of the cogwheels is driven by a drive shaft (12).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kraftstoff-Förderpumpe für eine Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe (1) für Brennkraftmaschinen, mit zwei in einer Pumpkammer (19) miteinander in Eingriff befindlichen rotierenden Zahnrädern (15, 16), die Kraftstoff aus einem mit einem Vorratsraum verbundenen Ansaugraum entlang einem zwischen den Stirnflächen der Zahnräder (15, 16) und der Umfangswand der Pumpkammer (19) gebildeten Förderkanal in einen mit der Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe (1) verbundenen Druckraum fördern, wobei eines (15) der Zahnräder (15, 16) durch eine Antriebswelle (12) angetrieben ist. Um die Verwendung in einem Baukastenprinzip für verschiedene Anwendungen zu ermöglichen, ist die Antriebswelle (12) mit einem Übersetzungsgetriebe (8, 13) gekoppelt. In einer Brennkraftmaschine ist die Antriebswelle (12) der Kraftstoff-Förderpumpe (2) zentrisch oder exzentrisch zu der Nockenwelle (7) der Kraftstoff-Einspritzpumpe (1) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F02M 37/06 (2006.01); F02M 39/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/041 (2013.01); F02M 37/06 (2013.01); F02M 39/005 (2013.01); F02M 59/44 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19625488 A1 19980115 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039121 A2 20000927; EP 1039121 A3 20010328; DE 19913804 A1 20000928; JP 2000291502 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010929

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI