Global Patent Index - EP 1039122 A1

EP 1039122 A1 2000-09-27 - Fuel injector

Title (en)

Fuel injector

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Injecteur à combustible

Publication

EP 1039122 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106435 A

Priority

IT BO990141 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injector (1) comprising a main tubular body (2) provided with at least one through duct (3) that terminates in a spray nozzle (3a) adapted to atomise the fuel contained in the through duct (3), a shutter member (4) moving axially in this through duct (3) from and to a closed position in which the shutter member (4) is disposed in abutment on the spray nozzle (3a) closing it off in such a way as to prevent any discharge of fuel, and lastly a hydraulic damper (8) adapted to brake the shutter member (4) during its return to the above-mentioned closed position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/20; F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/20 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039122 A1 20000927; EP 1039122 B1 20061122; BR 0002326 A 20001017; DE 60031904 D1 20070104; DE 60031904 T2 20070614; ES 2275458 T3 20070616; IT 1309674 B1 20020130; IT BO990141 A1 20000926; IT BO990141 D0 19990326

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60031904

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2275458

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-02-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60031904

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB SE

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MATTIOLI, MASSIMO

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NERETTI, MASSIMO

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TASSINARI, LUCA

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI