Global Patent Index - EP 1039140 A2

EP 1039140 A2 2000-09-27 - Feed pump

Title (en)

Feed pump

Title (de)

Förderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe d'alimentation

Publication

EP 1039140 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103931 A

Priority

DE 19912314 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has a driven rotor (1) with a ring of blade chambers on one side, and rotor blades to define the chambers. The rotor blades (3) are positioned along the height of the rotor chambers (2) at an angle, which is defined by a formula calculated from the distance between the center of the rotor and a point on a rotor blade, the distance between the rotor center and a chosen point on the rotor blade, and a set angle. The set angle on the radial outer edge of a rotor blade is between 30 and 40 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Nach dem Seitenkanal- oder Peripheralprinzip arbeitende Förderpumpen sind aus dem Einsatz in Kraftstoff-Fördereinheiten von Kraftfahrzeugen bekannt. Diese Förderpumpen besitzen vielfach in einem Laufrad gegenüberliegende Kränze von Schaufelkammern, die durch Laufschaufeln begrenzt werden. Laufräder, deren Laufschaufeln gegenüberliegender Schaufelkammern V-förmig zueinander angeordnet erreichen bereits gute Wirkungsgrade. Die neue Förderpumpe soll gegenüber diesen einen verbesserten Wirkungsgrad besitzen. Die Laufschaufeln (3) der Förderpumpe sind in einem Winkel in Bezug auf die Drehachse des Laufrades angeordnet, wobei sich dieser Winkel der Laufschaufeln (3) vom radial inneren zum radial äußeren Bereich proportional zur radialen Erstreckung der Laufschaufel vergrößert. Die Förderpumpe ist besonders für den Einsatz in einer Kraftstoff-Fördereinheit in einem Kraftfahrzeug geeignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/188 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039140 A2 20000927; EP 1039140 A3 20001108; EP 1039140 B1 20020605; BR 0001376 A 20001010; DE 19912314 A1 20000928; DE 19912314 C2 20021010; ES 2177487 T3 20021216; US 6302639 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160225

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100226

2011-12-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111219

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100225

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100225

2010-04-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TI AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES GMBH, SPECIALTY PRODUCTS

- Effective date: 20030225

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-08 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040715

2003-04-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TI AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES GMBH

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177487 T3

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000194 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 29/18 A, 7F 04D 5/00 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI