Global Patent Index - EP 1039143 A2

EP 1039143 A2 2000-09-27 - Hydraulic oil block

Title (en)

Hydraulic oil block

Title (de)

Ölhydraulikblock

Title (fr)

Bloc à huile hydraulique

Publication

EP 1039143 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102835 A

Priority

DE 29905136 U

Abstract (en)

Modular subassembly comprises an adapter (1), a basic module (2) and an expansion module (3). The adapter is preferably a pump adapter and has a connection (12) for return oil drainage. The basic module preferably has connections for oil pressure monitor (22), solenoid valve (23), pressure gauge (24) and emptying.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Ölhydraulikblock in modularer Baugruppenstruktur für den Einsatz an Öl- beziehungsweise Mehrstoffbrennern für die industrielle Wärmeerzeugung, wobei sich die modulare Baugruppe aus einem Pumpenadapter (1), einem Basismodul (2) und einem Erweiterungsmodul (3) zusammensetzt. Der Ölhydraulikblock ist an Öl- und Mehrstoffbrennern unterschiedlichster Bauart einsetzbar. Die angeführten Brenner sind Bestandteile von Feuerungsanlagen für Warmwasserkessel, Dampferzeuger, Thermalölerhitzer, Heißgaserzeuger oder andere Wärmeerzeuger. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F23K 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/0821 (2013.01); F15B 13/086 (2013.01); F15B 13/0871 (2013.01); F15B 13/0889 (2013.01); F15B 13/0892 (2013.01); F23K 5/14 (2013.01); F23K 2301/203 (2013.01); F23K 2301/204 (2013.01); F23K 2301/206 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905136 U1 19990610; EP 1039143 A2 20000927; EP 1039143 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI