Global Patent Index - EP 1039144 A2

EP 1039144 A2 2000-09-27 - Hydraulic control device

Title (en)

Hydraulic control device

Title (de)

Hydraulische Steuereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande hydraulique

Publication

EP 1039144 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124451 A

Priority

DE 19912299 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure difference loading the second slide (32) is taken in the feed (12) and downstream of the choke point (18) in the first supply circuit (14) and the spring (40) loading this second slide is stronger than the spring (22) loading the first slide (24). Both slides are arranged in the pump cover and one slide is cup-shaped where it faces the spring. Specifically both sides are held in blind holes in opposite housing sides of the pump cover and each spring in the blind holes acts on a plug shutting off the respective blind hole. Additional components include the pump (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einer hydraulische Steuereinrichtung mit zumindest einer Pumpe (10), die über einen Zulauf (12) einen ersten Versorgungskreis (14) für einen Vorrangmotor und einen zweiten Versorgungskreis (16) für einen Zusatzmotor mit Druckmittel versorgt, wobei in den ersten Versorgungskreis (14) des Vorrangmotors eine Drosselstelle (18, 20) geschaltet ist und eine an dieser Drosselstelle (18, 20) abgreifbare Druckdifferenz entgegen einer Federkraft einer Feder (22) auf einen ersten im ersten Versorgungskreis (14) angeordneten Steuerschieber (24, 26) wirkt und mit einem zweiten Steuerschieber (32, 34), der zwischen der Pumpe (10) und dem zweiten Versorgungskreis (16) angeordnet ist, der von einer Druckdifferenz entgegen einer Federkraft einer Feder (40) belastbar ist. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß die den zweiten Steuerschieber (32, 34) belastende Druckdifferenz im Zulauf (12) und stromabwärts nach der im ersten Versorgungskreis (14) angeordneten Drosselstelle (18, 20) abgegriffen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/02; F15B 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/16 (2006.01); F15B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/162 (2013.01); F15B 13/022 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40561 (2013.01); F15B 2211/428 (2013.01); F15B 2211/45 (2013.01); F15B 2211/455 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50572 (2013.01); F15B 2211/57 (2013.01); F15B 2211/781 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912299 A1 20000921; EP 1039144 A2 20000927; EP 1039144 A3 20030305; EP 1039144 B1 20050727

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131208

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912330

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912330

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130225

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091208

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051107

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912330 P 20050901

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI