Global patent index - EP 1039145 A2

EP 1039145 A2 2000-09-27 - Electrohydraulic control device

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic control device

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulische Steuereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande électrohydraulique

Publication

EP 1039145 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100019 A

Priority

DE 19913205 A

Abstract (en)

The controller controls the flow of hydraulic medium to a hydraulic control motor depending on electrical input signals to a magnetic drive that displaces a control sliding element in a valve housing from a spring-centered central position into working positions on either side. The sliding element is centered by a dual action restoring device, whereby inner and outer springs are arranged mutually concentrically on the same side of the control sliding element. A first adjuster has a first spring plate (34) in the form of a toothed wheel (43) and an externally adjustable setting spindle (45). A second spring plate (36) in the form of a toothed wheel (53) forms part of a transmission (57) externally adjustable via a second setting spindle (56).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine elektrohydraulische Steuereinrichtung (40) mit einer doppeltwirkenden Rückstelleinrichtung (41) vorgeschlagen, bei der zur Einstellung der Betriebspunkte des Wegeventils (11) die Vorspannung beider Federn (30, 32) während der hydraulischen Prüfung stufenlos von außen veränderbar ist. Die konzentrisch zueinanderliegenden Federn (30, 32) der Rückstelleinrichtung (41) stützen sich jeweils über Federteller (34, 36) ab, die als Zahnräder (43, 53) zweier von außen verstellbarer Schneckengetriebe (46, 57) ausgebildet sind, wobei das eine Zahnrad verdrehbar im anderen Zahnrad geführt ist. Die Rückstelleinrichtung (41) baut kompakt, relativ einfach und kostengünstig und verkürzt die Prüf- und Einstellzeit bei magnetbetätigten Ventilen erheblich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/044

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039145 A2 20000927; EP 1039145 A3 20010228; EP 1039145 B1 20040512; DE 19913205 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50006372

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070104

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070104

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006372

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI