Global Patent Index - EP 1039146 A1

EP 1039146 A1 2000-09-27 - Pilot operated filling valve

Title (en)

Pilot operated filling valve

Title (de)

Hydraulisch entsperrbares Füllventil

Title (fr)

Soupape de remplissage pilotée

Publication

EP 1039146 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105865 A

Priority

DE 29905322 U

Abstract (en)

The filling valve (F) has a valve element (V) with a shaft (4), adjustable relative to a valve seat (P). The shaft is in a setting device (E). It can be moved by the unlocking drive against a return force from a closed position to a preset open position, bringing a counter-stop (R) on the shaft against a fixed stop (S). An impact damping device (G) is fitted in the setting device between the counter-stop and the stop.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem hydraulisch entsperrbaren Ventil (F) für eine Hydraulikpresse, mit einem relativ zu einem Ventilsitz (P) verstellbaren, einen Schaft (4) aufweisenden Ventilelement (V), dessen Schaft (4) in einer Verstelleinrichtung (E) angeordnet und durch einen Entsperrantrieb gegen eine Rückstellkraft aus einer Schließstellung in eine vorbestimmte Offenstellung und mit einem Gegenanschlag (R) gegen einen stationären Anschlag (S) bringbar ist, wird in der Verstelleinrichtung (E) zwischen dem Gegenanschlag (R) und dem Anschlag (S) eine Aufschlagdämpfvorrichtung (G) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/18 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/183 (2013.01); F15B 13/0407 (2013.01); F15B 15/226 (2013.01); F15B 15/227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905322 U1 19990624; AT 274647 T 20040915; EP 1039146 A1 20000927; EP 1039146 B1 20040825

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 274647 T

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007535

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150320

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007535 P 20040930

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAWE HYDRAULIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI