Global Patent Index - EP 1039215 A1

EP 1039215 A1 2000-09-27 - Improved signal light for motor vehicle comprising a plurality of light sources

Title (en)

Improved signal light for motor vehicle comprising a plurality of light sources

Title (de)

Verbesserte Kraftfahrzeugleuchte mit mehreren Lichtquellen

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation multi-sources perfectionné pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1039215 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400377 A

Priority

FR 9903443 A

Abstract (en)

The signal lighting comprises of a housing that is closed by a clear lens (22). The interior of the lens includes a series of angular faces (21,211) that refract the light evenly across the lens. A light housing (10) comprises a light source (11), in this case an LED. The internal lens facings refract the light that is emitted by the LED uniformly across the lens surface.

Abstract (fr)

Un feu de signalisation comprend une pluralité de sources lumineuses (10) et des moyens (20) de traitement optique de la lumière issue des sources pour engendrer un faisceau de signalisation dans une plage éclairante d'étendue donnée, et un voyant extérieur (40) essentiellement inactif du point de vue optique; les moyens de traitement comprennent un élément de traitement optique (20) au droit de chacune desdites sources. Selon l'invention, chaque élément de traitement optique (20) est constitué par un ballon individuel apte à effectuer une répartition de la lumière reçue vers toute l'étendue la plage éclairante, lesdits ballons individuels étant montés au droit d'ouvertures (55) formées dans un support (50). Application notamment aux feux matriciels à diodes électroluminescentes pour véhicules automobiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/2212 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039215 A1 20000927; EP 1039215 B1 20061025; DE 60031469 D1 20061207; DE 60031469 T2 20070823; ES 2274769 T3 20070601; FR 2791121 A1 20000922; FR 2791121 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090210

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080210

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2274769

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061220

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60031469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI