Global Patent Index - EP 1039225 A2

EP 1039225 A2 2000-09-27 - A valve unit for regulating the flow-rate of a fuel gas

Title (en)

A valve unit for regulating the flow-rate of a fuel gas

Title (de)

Ventileinheit zur Regelung des Durchflusses von Brenngas

Title (fr)

Unité de soupape pour commander le débit d'un gaz de combustible

Publication

EP 1039225 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202114 A

Priority

IT PD990058 A

Abstract (en)

A valve unit for regulating the flow-rate of a fuel gas delivered through a delivery duct (3) is described and comprises a servo-valve (4) having a closure element (5) controlled by a diaphragm (8), the diaphragm being subjected to the gas-delivery pressure on one side and to a reference pressure established in a control chamber (9) of the servo-valve on the other side, a pressure-regulator device associated with the servo-valve (4) and comprising a regulation valve (10; 51) for controlling the reference pressure in the control chamber (9), additional regulator means for modulating the delivery pressure and/or the output flow-rate of gas through the delivery duct (3) in dependence on an external control, the additional regulator means acting alternatively on the pressure-regulator device or on means (53) for choking the delivery duct in order to modulate the delivery pressure, or to modulate the flow-rate delivered through the delivery duct (3), respectively, and actuator means for the additional regulator means, comprising a reversible motor (32) having a rotor (31) connected to a male-and-female screw coupling (28, 29; 58, 57) acting on the pressure-regulator device or on the choking means, for the operative control thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/10; F23N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/007 (2013.01); F23N 5/102 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01); F23N 2035/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039225 A2 20000927; EP 1039225 A3 20020508; DE 1039225 T1 20010607; ES 2151874 T1 20010116; IT 1308112 B1 20011129; IT PD990058 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-01-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151874

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2001-01-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2000-12-01 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990714

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI