Global Patent Index - EP 1039228 A2

EP 1039228 A2 2000-09-27 - Ceramic tile

Title (en)

Ceramic tile

Title (de)

Keramikkachel

Title (fr)

Carreau en céramique

Publication

EP 1039228 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104855 A

Priority

DE 29905178 U

Abstract (en)

The ceramic tile (10) has a decorative element (24) which can be fitted to and removed from it. For this purpose, gripping magnets (22) in recesses (20) in the tile body (12) may be used in combination with a plate-form counter-magnet (26) on the decorative element. The counter-magnet itself may form the decorative element, or may be attached to one made of ceramic, natural stone, wood or glass.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Keramikkachel (12) mit einem Verzierungselement mit der Möglichkeit, dieses bei Bedarf nachträglich anzubringen oder gegen ein anderes auszutauschen. Zu diesem Zweck ist das Verzierungselement (24) lösbar an der Kachel (12) befestigt, wobei zur lösbaren Befestigung vorzugsweise Haftmagnete (22) dienen, die in jeweils einer Aussparung (20) der Kachel (12) befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/06; F24B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/06 (2006.01); F24C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/06 (2013.01); F24B 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905178 U1 19990617; EP 1039228 A2 20000927; EP 1039228 A3 20020102; NO 20001180 A 20000921; NO 20001180 D0 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24B 1/06 A, 7F 24B 15/06 B, 7F 24C 15/06 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI