Global patent index - EP 1039235 A2

EP 1039235 A2 2000-09-27 - Hood with virtual barrier for the automatic activation of lamps and/or fan

Title (en)

Hood with virtual barrier for the automatic activation of lamps and/or fan

Title (de)

Dunstabzugshaube mit virtuellem Sperrnetzwerk zur selbstätigen Aktivierung von Lampen und/oder Gebläsen

Title (fr)

Hotte aspirante avec barrière virtuelle permettant l'activation automatique de lampes et/ou ventilateurs

Publication

EP 1039235 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830116 A

Priority

IT MC990006 U

Abstract (en)

The present patent application relates to a hood capable of producing a virtual barrier down towards the cooktop, it being provided that the user's interference with the virtual barrier causes the immediate automatic switching on of the lamps and the increase in the rotation speed of the fan. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F23L (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/2021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039235 A2 20000927; EP 1039235 A3 20020424; IT 248341 Y1 20030128; IT MC990006 U1 20000824

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI