Global Patent Index - EP 1039236 A2

EP 1039236 A2 2000-09-27 - Storage boiler of the combined type

Title (en)

Storage boiler of the combined type

Title (de)

Kombinierter Speicherkessel

Title (fr)

Chaudière mixte à accumulation

Publication

EP 1039236 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200973 A

Priority

IT MI990596 A

Abstract (en)

A storage boiler (1) of the so-called combined type, comprises a secondary heat exchanger (4) provided with respective first thermal exchange means for heating sanitary water supplied to said exchanger (4), a unit (5) for producing and storing hot sanitary water provided with respective second thermal exchange means (19) for heating the sanitary water stored within said unit (5), and a secondary hydraulic circuit (20) for the circulation of sanitary water, provided with means (27) for selectively drawing off the sanitary water heated by said secondary heat exchanger (4) and/or by said unit (5) for producing and storing hot sanitary water. The storing unit (5) is arranged in the secondary hydraulic circuit (20) for the circulation of sanitary water in parallel to the secondary heat exchanger (4). In the boiler of the invention the second thermal exchange means (19) provided in the unit (5) for producing and storing hot sanitary water is essentially in parallel to the first thermal exchange means, so that heating of the unit (5) for producing and storing hot sanitary water may be independently carried out with respect to the secondary heat exchanger (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039236 A2 20000927; EP 1039236 A3 20001108; IT 1311765 B1 20020319; IT MI990596 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI