Global Patent Index - EP 1039241 A2

EP 1039241 A2 2000-09-27 - A device for the anchorage to a wall of radiators for ambient heating

Title (en)

A device for the anchorage to a wall of radiators for ambient heating

Title (de)

Wandkonsole für Heizköper

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour monter un radiateur contre un mur

Publication

EP 1039241 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118183 A

Priority

IT PD990032 U

Abstract (en)

A device for the anchorage to a wall (2) of radiators (3) is described which comprises a first member (4) extending substantially longitudinally, arranged to be fixed to the wall and bearing at one of its longitudinal ends a hook formation (6), a second member (8) slidably guided on the first member (4) in the longitudinal direction, bearing a second hook formation (7) and movable between a first, operative position, in which the second hook formation (7) is capable of engaging, by hooking, a portion (3b) of a radiator (3) to be anchored to the wall, and a second, inoperative position, in which the hook formation (7) is disengaged from the radiator portion (3b), as well as retaining means and complementary retaining means (18, 19) on the first and second member for detachably locking the second member (8) relative to the first member (4) in the second, inoperative position, in which respective snap locking and complementary snap locking means (20) are provided on the first and second member for detachably snap locking the second member (8) relative to the first member (4) in the first, operative position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0286 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0216 (2013.01); F24D 19/0283 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2054 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039241 A2 20000927; EP 1039241 A3 20021002; IT 247726 Y1 20020910; IT PD990032 U1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI