Global Patent Index - EP 1039243 A2

EP 1039243 A2 2000-09-27 - Air conditioner

Title (en)

Air conditioner

Title (de)

Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1039243 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104866 A

Priority

JP 8333599 A

Abstract (en)

When the air conditioner is discarded and incinerated, generation of harmful matter is prevented. Recycling of material and thermal recycling are easy, and environmental loads are decreased. Preventive effect of leak of dew condensation water is improved. Long-term aging of drain cap is decreased, and the preventive effect of leak of dew condensation water lasts for a longer period, and the long-term reliability of air conditioner is enhanced. When moving the air conditioner, it is easier to detach and attach the drain cap. It includes a heat exchanger for exchanging heat with air, a drain pan unit disposed in the lower direction of the heat exchanger, a first discharge port and a second discharge port disposed to communicate with the drain pan unit, a drain hose connected to the first discharge port, and a drain cap disposed in the second discharge port. The drain pan unit has a function of receiving the dew condensation water generated from the heat exchanger, and the drain cap is composed of a hydrogenated polymer of copolymer including styrene group and unsaturated hydrocarbon group. The hydrogenated polymer of copolymer including styrene group and unsaturated hydrocarbon group includes a hydrogenated polymer of styrene-butadiene block copolymer or a hydrogenated polymer of styrene-isoprene block copolymer. Preferably, the drain pan unit is made of high-impact styrene resin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 13/222 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039243 A2 20000927; EP 1039243 A3 20010516; EP 1039243 B1 20040121; DE 60007791 D1 20040226; DE 60007791 T2 20041104; ES 2211395 T3 20040716; JP 2000274723 A 20001006; JP 3606099 B2 20050105; MY 122650 A 20060429

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120307

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60007791

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211395

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60007791

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI