Global Patent Index - EP 1039258 A1

EP 1039258 A1 2000-09-27 - Multicalibre torpedo launching tube

Title (en)

Multicalibre torpedo launching tube

Title (de)

Torpodorohr zum Abschiessen von Torpedos unterschiedlichen Kalibers

Title (fr)

Tube lance torpille multicalibre

Publication

EP 1039258 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400841 A

Priority

  • FR 9903727 A
  • FR 9907697 A

Abstract (en)

Launcher tube has supporting means (10) comprising four longitudinal slides (2), and inflatable pockets (5). Slides are attached to support (3) fixed on tube. Upper slide has inverse U-shaped slot (4) working with outgrowth on torpedo. Inflatable pockets are placed along tube and on each side of lower slide. All pockets are linked to same liquid network.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a plus particulièrement pour objet un tube lance-torpille comprenant des moyens (10) aptes à supporter la torpille (6) et à limiter ses frottements lors de son expulsion, tels des glissières, tube caractérisé en ce que ces moyens sont à géométrie variable et aptes à prendre au moins deux positions, dont l'une par laquelle passe un cercle de diamètre égal au diamètre maximal admissible de la torpille et la seconde par laquelle passe un cercle de diamètre inférieur audit diamètre admissible, ces moyens comportant des vessies gonflables (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41F 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41F 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039258 A1 20000927; FR 2791424 A1 20000929; FR 2791424 B1 20010713

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020803

2003-07-16 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020805

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI