Global Patent Index - EP 1039304 A2

EP 1039304 A2 2000-09-27 - Measuring process for a high voltage lead-through and related device

Title (en)

Measuring process for a high voltage lead-through and related device

Title (de)

Messverfahren für eine Hochspannungsdurchführung und geeignete Messanordnung

Title (fr)

Méthode de mesure d'une traversée de haute tension et dispositif associé

Publication

EP 1039304 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100471 A

Priority

DE 19912410 A

Abstract (en)

A component voltage is detected and an input voltage for each phase via a capacitive high voltage divider. The input voltage is subjected to level matching and voltage limiting, a potential division is performed and the input voltage value is processed in two separate and independent channels. The first channel determines the absolute value of the input voltage and feeds it to a sample-and-hold circuit which drives a current source circuit. The output of the current source circuit has a value that is proportional to the peak value of the input voltage. The second channel rectifies the signal and uses it to drive a further current source circuit, whose output current is proportional to the RMS value of the input voltage. An Independent claim is included for a measuring apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Meßverfahren für eine Hochspannungsdurchführung sowie eine dafür besonders geeignete Meßanordnung. Erfindungsgemäß erfolgt die Verarbeitung der Eingangsspannung dabei parallel in zwei Kanäle. Im ersten Kanal wird eine Betragsbildung vorgenommen, dieser Wert anschließend einer Sample- and Hold-Schaltung zugeführt und danach mit dem erhaltenen Wert ein Stromquellenschaltkreis angesteuert. Im zweiten Kanal erfolgt eine Gleichrichtung, und der erhaltene Wert steuert einen weiteren Stromquellenschaltkreis an. Damit ist es möglich, sowohl den Spitzenwert der Eingangsspannung als auch den Effektivwert der Eingangsspannung zu messen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 15/14; G01R 19/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 15/14 (2006.01); G01R 19/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 15/14 (2013.01); G01R 19/2513 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039304 A2 20000927; EP 1039304 A3 20040204; EP 1039304 B1 20051026; AT 308051 T 20051115; DE 19912410 A1 20001012; DE 50011410 D1 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011410

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-09-23 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 308051 T

- Effective date: 20140111

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011410

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130116

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011410 P 20051201

2005-11-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-11-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI