Global Patent Index - EP 1039345 A3

EP 1039345 A3 2000-12-06 - Method for subtitling cinematographic films, especially on polyester based support

Title (en)

Method for subtitling cinematographic films, especially on polyester based support

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Untertiteln kinematographischer Filme, insbesondere auf einem Polyesterträger

Title (fr)

Procédé de sous-titrage de films cinématographiques, en particulier sur support à base de polyester

Publication

EP 1039345 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99870281 A

Priority

  • EP 99870281 A
  • EP 99870059 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039345A2] Cleaning of cine films which have been subtitled by laser etching, by impinging a jet of steam and/or hot air onto the emulsion immediately after the etching procedure. Procedure for subtitling cinematographic films comprises etching graphical elements or text onto polyester or other film by means of a laser beam impinging on the film in the zone to be marked, wherein in a first stage etching is carried out using a laser beam with a rate of displacement of 1-200 (10-60) cm/sec and a power of 100 milliwatt - 20 (1-10) watt at the surface of the film, the ratio V/P between the rate of displacement in cm/second and the power at the level of the film in watts being 2-10 cm/second watt, and in a second stage the etched film is subjected to a finishing treatment to render the laser-etched zones of the subtitle transparent, using a jet of steam and/or hot air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] EP 0537068 A1 19930414 - TITRA FILM SA [FR], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039345 A2 20000927; EP 1039345 A3 20001206; EP 1039345 B1 20040310

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOSMAN ANDRE

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOSMAN PHILIPPE

- Effective date: 20111231

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-18 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20081031

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TITRA FILM,

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DK FR LI NL

2004-03-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DK FR LI NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DK FR LI NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI