Global patent index - EP 1039353 A1

EP 1039353 A1 2000-09-27 - Watch case provided with a decorative element

Title (en)

Watch case provided with a decorative element

Title (de)

Uhrengehäuse mit einem Zierelement

Title (fr)

Boîte de montre pourvue d'une pièce de décor

Publication

EP 1039353 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810192 A

Priority

EP 99810192 A

Abstract (en)

The watch case has on its edge a decorative part (50) extending around a shoulder (20) to which are connected a base (30) and a glass (40) whose interior face (22) surrounds a movement (10) carried on a circle (11). The movement (10) is connected to a winder (16) via a winder spindle (15). A gap is provided between the decorative part (50) and the adjacent parts (20,30) of the shoulder and base (30). Means (60,70) ensure the gap is maintained and also act as seals and shock absorbers between the movement (10) and the decorative part (50).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une boîte de montre pourvue d'un élément de décor (50) ayant la particularité d'être difficilement usinable, de surcroît avec des précisions assez grossières, soit plus ou moins un 1/10 ème de millimètre autour d'une cote de référence, tandis que les fabricants de boîte travaillent usuellement avec des précisions de l'ordre du 1/100 ème. L'handicap est levé en prévoyant un écart entre la pièce de décor (50) et les éléments adjacents (20, 30), soit la carrure et le fond respectivement et grâce à des moyens (60, 70) assurant le maintien de ces écarts, ces moyens exerçant dans le même temps les fonctions d'étanchéité et d'amortissement des chocs aussi bien contre le mouvement (10) que la pièce de décor (50). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 45/00 (2006.01); G04B 37/08 (2006.01); G04B 37/18 (2006.01); G04B 47/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 47/046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039353 A1 20000927; JP 2000310687 A 20001107; US 6382829 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1036329

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050701

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI