Global Patent Index - EP 1039354 A2

EP 1039354 A2 2000-09-27 - Display with at least one hand, in particular for clocks

Title (en)

Display with at least one hand, in particular for clocks

Title (de)

Anzeige mit mindestens einem Zeiger, insbesondere für Uhren

Title (fr)

Affichage avec au moins une aiguille en particulier pour montres

Publication

EP 1039354 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124883 A

Priority

DE 19860266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860266A1] The pointer or indicator (Z) may rotate through 360 degrees in front of a dial with a reference mark (P). The pointer may rotate counterclockwise until it is stopped by a spring-loaded pawl (R) engaging a ratchet tooth (A) on a large gearwheel (Z1) fastened to the pointer. The pointer may rotate continuously in the clockwise direction. The electric drive motor (E) turns a small gearwheel (Z2), which meshes with the large gearwheel on the pointer. A detector circuit (V) monitors the current through the drive motor.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Anzeige mit mindestens einem Zeiger, der mit einem elektrischen Antrieb antreibbar ist, wobei mit dem Zeiger oder den Zeigern Drehungen in eine erste Richtung von mehr als 360° ausführbar sind, ist vorgesehen, daß der oder die Zeiger (Z) in eine zweite Richtung (CCW) drehbar sind, sind der erste in Richtung (CW) entgegengesetzt ist, daß der oder einer der Zeiger (Z) in die zweite Richtung (CCW) nur bis zu einer bestimmten Position (P) drehbar ist und in dieser Position eine Referenzstellung einnimmt, daß eine Detektiervorrichtung (V) vorhanden ist, die ein nicht Weiterdrehen können der Zeigers (Z) in die zweite Richtung (CCW) detektiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01D 7/00 (2006.01); G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G01D 5/22 (2006.01); G01D 13/22 (2006.01); G04B 19/00 (2006.01); G04C 3/14 (2006.01); G04C 9/00 (2006.01); G04F 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/14 (2013.01); G04C 3/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860266 A1 20000706; EP 1039354 A2 20000927; EP 1039354 A3 20060315; JP 2000193499 A 20000714; KR 100756111 B1 20070905; KR 20000048401 A 20000725; US 6351435 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091203

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080219

2006-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G04C 3/00 20060101AFI20000803BHEP

2006-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G04C 3/14 20060101ALI20060120BHEP

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI