Global patent index - EP 1039355 A1

EP 1039355 A1 2000-09-27 - Process for manufacturing indicator organs and indicator organ manufactured accordingly

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing indicator organs and indicator organ manufactured accordingly

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Anzeigeorganen für Uhren und nach diesem Verfahren hergestelltes Anzeigeorgan

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un organe d'affichage pour pièce d'horlogerie et organe d'affichage fabriqué selon ce procédé

Publication

EP 1039355 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99105905 A

Priority

EP 99105905 A

Abstract (en)

The method has the foll0wing stages: - use a plastic strip (3), see FIg.10, with width (A) suitable to encompass the ring (1) diameter; - deform the plastic strip by thermo-forming so as to form a profile (B) corresponding to that required for the ring (1); - separate the ring (1) from the plastic strip by cutting around the exterior contour of the ring. The thermo-forming source is realized by air pressure (E). The pressure forces the plastic sheet against a mold which has the required profile. Alternatively the thermo-forming source may be air suction (F). The suction forces the sheet to be applied against the bottom of the mold (6) having the desired shape. Another alternative is to compress the sheet between two complementary molds having the required shape

Abstract (fr)

Pour fabriquer l'organe d'affichage destiné à une pièce d'horlogerie, on fournit une feuille en matière plastique conformée en bande (3). On déforme ensuite à l'aide d'outils (4, 6) et par thermoformage la feuille pour lui conférer un profil (10, 11, 13, B) correspondant à celui que présente l'organe d'affichage une fois terminé. Enfin, on sépare ledit organe de la bande par découpage, ce découpage correspondant au contour extérieur (20) dudit organe. Un tel organe peut être un disque de quantième ou encore un cadran. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/12 (2006.01); G04D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/12 (2013.01); G04D 3/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039355 A1 20000927; EP 1039355 B1 20081126; DE 69939973 D1 20090108

INPADOC legal status

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69939973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69939973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-01-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070531

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI