Global patent index - EP 1039357 A2

EP 1039357 A2 2000-09-27 - Device for adjusting operating parameters in multiple programmable integrated circuits

Title (en)

Device for adjusting operating parameters in multiple programmable integrated circuits

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Einstellen von Betriebsgrössen in mehreren programmierbaren integrierten Schaltungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ajustage des paramètres opératoires pour plusieurs circuits intégrés programmables

Publication

EP 1039357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105473 A

Priority

DE 19912446 A

Abstract (en)

The device applies a digital control command, which can be evaluated by an internal controller, to the input of each IC (IC1-IC3), whose earth connection is connected to earth potential. Each IC outputs state information. The inputs (E1-E3) of several ICs are connected together and each output (A1-A3) is separately fed to a control unit (22). After receiving a blocking control command each IC locks the evaluation of received control commands and the output is set to a state in which control signals can be received and evaluated. The external control unit feeds a trigger control signal to a selected IC via its output, whereupon the controller removes the lock and control commands are output to set the operating parameters to the inputs of the ICs. Independent claims are also included for a method of setting operating parameters in several programmable ICs and for a programmable IC.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Einstellen von Betriebsgrößen in mehreren programmierbaren integrierten Schaltungen (IC1, IC2, IC3). Die Eingänge (E1, E2, E3) mehrerer integrierter Schaltungen (IC1, IC2, IC3) sind miteinander verbunden, wobei jeder Ausgang (A1, A2, A3) getrennt zu einer externen Steuereinheit (22) geführt ist. Nach Erhalt eines Sperr-Steuerbefehls wird jede integrierte Schaltung (IC1, IC2, IC3) verriegelt. Die externe Steuereinheit (22) führt an eine ausgewählte integrierte Schaltung (IC1) über deren Ausgang (A1) ein Freigabe-Steuersignal zu, woraufhin die interne Steuerung (10) die Verriegelung aufhebt. Anschließend werden Steuerbefehle zum Einstellen der Betriebsgrößen an die Eingänge (E1, E2, E3) der integrierten Schaltungen (IC1, IC2, IC3) ausgegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 19/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/0426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039357 A2 20000927; EP 1039357 A3 20011114; EP 1039357 B1 20031008; DE 19912446 C1 20001109; US 6288567 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003966

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003966

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110315

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003966

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 05B 19/042 A, 7H 03K 19/173 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI