Global Patent Index - EP 1039435 A1

EP 1039435 A1 2000-09-27 - MECHANICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SUPPORTING AND MOVING PUBLICITY BANDEROLES AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

MECHANICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SUPPORTING AND MOVING PUBLICITY BANDEROLES AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

MECHANISCHE ANORDNUNG ZUM FESTHALTEN UND BEWEGEN VON WERBEBÄNDEN UND DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT MECANIQUE POUR SUPPORTER ET METTRE EN MOUVEMENT DES BANDEROLES PUBLICITAIRES ET AUTRES

Publication

EP 1039435 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943895 A

Priority

  • ES 9800259 W
  • ES 9801855 A
  • ES 9801961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0014707A1] Mechanical arrangement for supporting and moving publicity banderoles and the like, consisting in fixing bills or banderoles (4, 15 and 22) to support elements configured like cables (5 and 14) or optionally to a rail (21), presenting fixing elements on the surface of said rail and which are configured as bodies (23 and 23'); motors (6, 12 or 24) are provided to set in motion the bills or banderoles, which can be incorporated either to vertical supports or to building facades externally and internally, with the possibility of incorporating a powered-carriage sliding on rails.

Abstract (fr)

Disposition mécanique pour le support et la mobilisation de banderoles publicitaires et similaires consistant en la fixation de pancartes ou banderoles (4, 15, 22) sur des éléments de support constitués de câbles (5 et 14) ou en option sur un rail (21), présentant des éléments de fixation sur la superficie de ce rail configurés comme des corps (23 et 23'), la mobilisation des pancartes ou banderoles étant actionnée par des moteurs (6, 12 ou 14), pouvant être incorporé aussi bien sur des supports verticaux que sur la partie externe ou interne de façades de bâtiments et rendant possible l'utilisation d'un chariot coulissant sur des rails et doté d'un moteur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014707A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039435 A1 20000927; AU 9162598 A 20000327; WO 0014707 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033610

2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-22 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20021107

2004-09-22 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040220

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-11-29 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT