Global Patent Index - EP 1039445 A2

EP 1039445 A2 2000-09-27 - Apparatus for generating soundwaves with predetermined sound-lobe

Title (en)

Apparatus for generating soundwaves with predetermined sound-lobe

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Erzeugung von Schallwellen mit vorgegebener Schallkeule

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour générer des ondes acoustiques à lobe acoustique prédéterminée

Publication

EP 1039445 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105222 A

Priority

DE 19913871 A

Abstract (en)

An ultrasonic transducer (W) is used to produce sound waves with a rotationally symmetrical beam lobe. At least one scattering body (4) is positioned in the direction of sound propagation within the Fresnel zone of the ultrasonic transducer. The scattering body may be elongate in shape and positioned at right angles to the direction of sound propagation. Various other shapes are also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Erfindungsgemäß werden Schallwellen mit vorgegebener Schallkeule erzeugt, indem mittels eines richtscharfen Ultraschallwandlers (W) Schallwellen mit rotationssymmetrischer Schallkeule erzeugt werden und in der Schallausbreitungsrichtung innerhalb der Fresnel-Zone ein Streukörper (4,7,10,11,17,18) positioniert wird. Hierzu ist eine entsprechende Einrichtung, z.B. gemäß FIG 1 vorgesehen. Die Streukörper sind unterschiedlich ausgeführt, um astigmatische Schallkeulen oder rotationssymmetrische, aufgeweitete Schallkeulen zu erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039445 A2 20000927; EP 1039445 A3 20020109; DE 19913871 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI