Global Patent Index - EP 1039484 A3

EP 1039484 A3 2001-02-07 - Tension rod with end fasteners and method for manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Tension rod with end fasteners and method for manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Zuganker mit Endverbinder und sein Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Tirant d' ancrage avec des raccords d' extrémité et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1039484 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00660050 A

Priority

FI 990624 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039484A2] A tension rod (4) provided with end fasteners (1), and a method for manufacturing the same. The end fasteners (1) have socket-like elements (2) thereof secured by pressing around the ends of the tension rod (4) made of a composite material. Between the socket-like element (2) and the composite rod (4) is a gripping sleeve (5) made of a soft metal, particularly aluminium, which, when subjected to compression stress, establishes over its inner surface a grip on the outer surface of the tension rod (4) and over its outer surface a grip on the inner surface of the socket-like element (2). The gripping sleeve (5) increases tensile strength of the joint and, thus, also decreases the required dimensional measurements of the components. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/32; H01B 17/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/32 (2006.01); H01B 17/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/40 (2013.01); H01B 17/325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039484 A2 20000927; EP 1039484 A3 20010207; EE 03578 B1 20011217; EE 200000229 A 20001215; FI 105002 B 20000515; FI 990624 A0 19990319; NO 20001411 A 20000920; NO 20001411 D0 20000317; RU 2000106751 A 20020127

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020527

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010807;LV PAYMENT 20010807;SI PAYMENT 20010807

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI